Belyew v. Stapleton
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: Mark Stapleton
Case Number: 2:2017cv01065
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/3/2017 ORDERING the court takes no action on ECF No. 17 filing, as this case is now closed. Plaintiff is hereby informed that the court will not respond to future filings in this action that are not authorized by the FRCP or FRAP. (Henshaw, R)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/07/17 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lisa Belyew. The Sheriff of Butte County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Butte County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial) (Plummer, M)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/25/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belyew v. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?