Johnson v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Vijay C. Patel and Rekha V. Patel
Case Number: 2:2017cv01090
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/3/2017 ORDERING that, pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41 (a)(2), the entire case is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/09/17 ORDERING that 10 15 Clerk's Entry of Defaults are VACATED; this case is STAYED; Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than 30 days from the lifting of the stay; The parties are directed to promptly discuss settlement of this action. If the parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's VDRP Program by contacting the court's VDRP administrator. No later than f14 days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report. (cc: VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/27/2017 DENYING 11 Motion to be Heard to Vacate Default, 12 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to their renewal following the Status Conference SET for 8/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; ORDERING all parties to appear by counsel or in person if acting without counsel. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vijay C. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekha V. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?