Evans et al v. ZB, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ronald C Evans, Joan M Evans and Dennis Treadaway
Defendant: ZB, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01123
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/25/2020 CONTINUING deadlines as follows: Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2020, Motion to Designate Interim Counsel to be filed by 9/22/2020, Rule 26 Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and the Parties shall meet and confer on Rule 26 issues and file a Joint Conference Report no later than 9/14/2020. (Huang, H)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/23/2020 CONTINUING Case Deadlines for Settlement Discussions as follows: The Parties must exchange their initial disclosures on or before 8/27/2020; The date by which the Putative Class Action Representatives are to file and serve a Motion to designate their counsel as interim counsel is CONTINUED from 7/31/2020 to 9/8/2020. The Rule 26 Conference scheduled for 8/17/2020 is moved to 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Parties shall meet and confer on Rule 26 issues and file a joint conference report no later than 8/31/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Case Deadlines 64 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/5/2020: a. The Parties must exchange their initial disclosures under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) on or before 7/17/2020; b. The date by which the Putative Class Action Representatives are to file and serve a motion to designate their counsel as interim counsel under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) is continued from 7/10/2020 to 7/31/2020; c. The Status Conference Re Ninth Circuit Remand scheduled for 7/6/2020 is moved to 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb and d. The Parties shall meet and confer on Rule 26 issues and file a joint conference report no later than 8/3/2020. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/5/2020 CONTINUING the date that Plaintiffs' Counsel will file their motion for interim appointment of class counsel to 7/10/2020. (Becknal, R)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/4/2020 GRANTING 59 Stipulation for Extension of Time, GRANTING Third-Party Defendants JTS Communities, Inc., Larry A. Carter, Jack T. Sweigart, and Bristol Insurance Company until 6/1/2020 to respond to the 1 Complaint. (Coll, A)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/5/20 ORDERING that Status Conference is continued to 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Parties shall meet and confer on Rule 26 issues and file a joint status report no later than June 22, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/7/20 ORDERING that CB&T must file and serve an answer to the Putative Class Representatives' First Amended Complaint on or before January 31, 2020. The Parties must confe r and attempt to agree upon a discovery plan on or before March 20, 2020. The Parties must exchange their initial disclosures on or before April 3, 2020. Status Conference continued to 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Parties must file a joint status conference report on or before April 13, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/18/2019 GRANTING 45 Request to Seal Victim Impact Statements (Ex. H), and ORDERING that 44 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART as to the following claims: (1) intentional inte rference with contract; and (2) aiding and abetting breach of fiduciary duty; and DENIED IN PART as to the following claims: (1) aiding and abetting fraud; (2) conspiracy to commit fraud; (3) securities fraud based on transactions or acts after 5/26/2012; and (4) violation of Penal Code § 496. Plaintiff is GIVEN 14 days from the date this Order is filed to file a Second Amended Complaint. (Huang, H)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/28/19 ORDERING that the Putative Class Action Representatives shall file and serve a First Amended Complaint, consistent with the Ninth Circuit's Memorandum, on or before October 14, 2019. CB&T shall file and serve an answer or other responsive pleading, which includes the filing and service of a motion to dismiss, on or before November 15, 2019. Status Conference continued to 1/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than January 7, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/19/2017 GRANTING 21 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/17/2017 ORDERING Plaintiffs' Opposition to 21 Motion to Dismiss 11/6/2017; CB&T's reply shall be filed 11/20/2017; the motion hearing is CONTINUED to 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINED to 2/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 1/29/2018. (Washington, S)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 09/12/17 ORDERING that CB&T's 7 Referral Motion is WITHDRAWN without prejudice; CB&T shall have until 10/05/17 to file and serve its answer or other response to the Complaint. (Benson, A.)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/24/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall file and serve their opposition, if any, to the Referral Motion on or before 9/11/17; CB&T shall file and serve its reply to any opposition to t he Referral Motion on or before 9/25/17; and The hearing on Referral Motions 7 shall be CONTINUED from 9/11/17 to 10/2/2017 at 01:30 PM. CB&T shall have until 20 calendar days after notice of withdrawal of the Referral Motion or notice to the Parties of the Court's entry of its written order ruling on the Referral Motion, whichever is first, in which to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/28/2017 ORDERING the plaintiffs respond to the 7 Motion to Refer Civil Action to U.S. Bankruptcy Court by 8/28/2017; ORDERING the defendant to file its reply by 9/11/2017; CONTINUI NG the Motion Hearing on 7 Motion to Refer Civil Action to U.S. Bankruptcy Court to 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; GRANTING the defendant 20 calendar days after notice to the parties of the Court� 39;s entry of its written order re said referral motion to file and answer or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint; CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference to 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 11/6/2017. (Michel, G.)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/12/17 ORDERING that CB&T will have until 7/31/2017, to file and serve its answer or other responsive pleading to the above-entitled Class Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. ZB, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C Evans
Represented By: Aaron Lee Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M Evans
Represented By: Aaron Lee Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Treadaway
Represented By: Aaron Lee Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZB, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Scott McWhorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?