Johnson v. Valley Mack Plaza Co. L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Valley Mack Plaza Co. L.P., C and K Valley Mack, LLC, Starbucks Corporation, It's EID Inc., King's Wigs and Beauty Supply, Inc., Ross Dress For Less, Inc., Autozone West LLC, New York Rainbow USA Inc., DW Vision Corp. and BYS Supplies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01125
Filed: May 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/7/19 DENYING 53 Motion to Stay. (Kaminski, H)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/15/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/12/2018 SUBSTITUTING attorney Cathy L. Arias in place of Shane Singh. Attorney Shane Singh terminated. (Hunt, G)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/18/17 ORDERING that this case is STAYED pending further order of the court. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement. If the parties have not been able to informall y reach a settlement within 45 days, they shall initiate participation in the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. No later than 14 days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report (cc: VDRP). signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/18/17. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/17: The Clerk's Entry of Defaults against Defendants VALLEY MACK PLAZA CO. L.P. and C & K Valley Mack, LLC are hereby set aside. Defendants VALLEY MACK PLAZA CO. L.P. and C & K Valley Mack, LLC shall have twenty days after the date of this order to file their answers to the complaint. (Kaminski, H)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/17 ORDERING that 18 the Clerk's Entry of Default is SET ASIDE. Defendant AUTOZONE WEST LLC, shall have ten days after the date of this order to file its answer to the complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Valley Mack Plaza Co. L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Mack Plaza Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C and K Valley Mack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It's EID Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King's Wigs and Beauty Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Leggieri
Represented By: Kelsey Elizabeth Papst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Rainbow USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DW Vision Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYS Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?