Baucum et al v. Wicks et al

Plaintiff: Danny Baucum and Jutta Kosielowsky
Defendant: Cheryl Wicks, Nevada County Animal Control and Sammies Friends
Case Number: 2:2017cv01141
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/30/2018 GRANTING 31 and 36 Motions to Dismiss. Because Plaintiff apparently cannot add any allegations that she attempted to pick up her dog prior to it being deemed abandoned, those claims are hereby DISMISSED without leave to amend. Finally, the Court again DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state claims and they are DISMISSED as well. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/14/18, ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is modified to EXTEND the deadline for the Discovery Cutoff to 150 days after Defendants' Motions to Dismiss have been ruled on and Defendants have answered. (Kastilahn, A)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/11/8 GRANTING 20 21 Motions to Dismiss with 20 days LEAVE to AMEND. (Benson, A.)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/2017 GRANTING 18 Request for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to complete service. (Hunt, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baucum et al v. Wicks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County Animal Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammies Friends
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Baucum
Represented By: Corey Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jutta Kosielowsky
Represented By: Corey Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?