Belyew v. Reilly
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: James Reilly
Case Number: 2:2017cv01153
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING 12 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lisa Belyew signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/7/2017. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Butte County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/27/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/5/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff, within 30 days from the date of service of this order, to submit either the filing fee or IFP application. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belyew v. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?