Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v. Does 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01169
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/26/2019 ORDERING cases 2:17-cv-01169-TLN-EFB and 2:19-cv-01411-KJM-DB are RELATED. Case 2:19-cv-01411-KJM-DB is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2017 GRANTING Disposition of Seized Merchandise. (York, M)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/6/2017 GRANTING 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Seizure Order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Cara Rebecca Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?