Davies v. Premier Community Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Davies
Defendant: Premier Community Credit Union, Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01180
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/16/2017 GRANTING Defendant's Extension of Time to respond to the Amended Complaint until 11/6/2017. (Hunt, G)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/11/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to seal Exhibit F re 1 Complaint and Exhibit F to Exhibit A re 19 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; ORDERING the plaintiff to file redacted versions of said documents. (Michel, G.)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/17, ORDERING that Plaintiffs Matthew Davies and Molly Thompson are GRANTED leave to file an Amended Complaint, to be filed with the Court within ten (10) days of this Order. Defendant Premier Community Credit Union's responsive pleading shall be due 30 days after the Amended Complaint is filed. (Kastilahn, A)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/4/17 ORDERING that the hearing on Defendant Premier Community Credit Union's Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 9/21/2017 at 2:00 p.m., with Plaintiff's opposing papers to be filed and served not less than 14 calendar days prior to the continued hearing date. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davies v. Premier Community Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Eric O. Jeppson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Community Credit Union
Represented By: Roxanne T. Daneri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Eileen T Booth
Represented By: Scott E. Brady, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?