Russell v. KeHE Distributors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Russell
Defendant: KeHE Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01182
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/2/2018 GRANTING 34 Motion for Final Approval of Class Collective Action Settlement and 32 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Final Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2018 GRANTING 19 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement. (York, M)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/25/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/23/17. Plaintiff may filed an amended complaint to add a claim under the California Private Attorney General Act ("PAGA"); and Defendant's responsive pleading in this action is due 21 days from service of Plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. KeHE Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Russell
Represented By: John Paul Briscoe
Represented By: William J Gorham, III
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeHE Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Fuchsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?