Alonzo Joseph v. Noguchi
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Defendant: V. Noguchi
Case Number: 2:2017cv01193
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/14/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/13/2018 ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 2 Request for IFP. (Hunt, G)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/18/2017 VACATING 6 Order and RECOMMENDING that the 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Referred to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/11/17. (Plummer, M)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/12/2017 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is granted 30 days within which to pay the $400 filing fee for this action. (Henshaw, R)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/7/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-01193-AC(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonzo Joseph v. Noguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Noguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?