Belyew v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: L. Jackson
Case Number: 2:2017cv01198
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/7/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Jail Account of Lisa Belyew. The Butte County Sheriff's Office shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/27/17 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit either the filing fee or the application required by section 1915(a). The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/9/2017 ORDERING Cases 11cv1028 JAM EFB, 17cv1065 KJN, 17cv1083 DB, 17cv1153 GEB EFB, 17cv1165 DB, 17cv1198 EFB, 17cv1199 EFB and 17cv1200 EFB are RELATED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to make the appropriate adjustments to the case assignment. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belyew v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?