Foust v. Hardin Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carl Foust
Defendant: Hardin Insurance Company and Edmond Brown
Case Number: 2:2017cv01227
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/28/17 ORDERING that, 12 Letter, construed as a Request for Reconsideration, is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/22/17 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/2017 DENYING 20 Request for the Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/11/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 17 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/18/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Carl Foust. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/6/2017 DENYING without prejudice 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/16/17 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foust v. Hardin Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?