Engelbrecht v. Kern County Adult Protective Services et al

Plaintiff: Tonya Engelbrecht
Defendant: Kern County Adult Protective Services and Brand New Day Healthcare
Case Number: 2:2017cv01231
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/21/17 ORDERING that that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a new amended complaint will discharge this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Benson, A.)
July 19, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/2017 ORDERING that to the extent 4 Request is intended to serve as an amended complaint, it is DISMISSED for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's p rior order. Plaintiff will be granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that conforms to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's prior order. Plaintiff is specifically referred to pages 3 and 4 of th is court's prior 3 order for more detailed instructions on how to file a proper amended complaint. If plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, the undersigned may recommend that this action be dismissed. (Washington, S)
June 16, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING the 1 Complaint for failure to state a claim that can be heard by this court; GRANTING the plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engelbrecht v. Kern County Adult Protective Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Engelbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Adult Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand New Day Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?