Anderson v. Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: Eric Anderson
Defendant: B. Mendoza, J Stewart, T. Gomez, Tim Virga, G. Williams and R. Burt
Case Number: 2:2017cv01244
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/04/19 DENYING 39 Motion to reimburse. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the Case Inquiry Report associated with this action. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/12/2019 DENYING without prejudice 36 Motion to Reimburse. (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/19/19 DENYING as MOOT the 30 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Benson, A.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/8/2019 GRANTING 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED 60 days from the date of this order in which to file objections to 22 Findings and Recommendations. (Huang, H)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/11/2018 RECOMMENDING that 16 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Eric Anderson signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/25/18. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?