Lorven Technologies, Inc. v. Insight Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lorven Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Insight Technologies, Inc. and Mark Allen Fukui
Case Number: 2:2017cv01267
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/22/2018. Discovery due by 8/31/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/9/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/17/2017 GRANTING 23 Motion for Order permitting Service on Insight Technologies, Inc. through California Secretary of State. (Washington, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/21/2017. (mps) [Transferred from njd on 6/21/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorven Technologies, Inc. v. Insight Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorven Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Papalia, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen Fukui
Represented By: Dennis M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?