Canada v. CDCR, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, California Medical Facility and Department of State Hospital
Case Number: 2:2017cv01329
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/24/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court assign a District Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/13/18 ORDERING plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Lee Canada. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/6/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. CDCR, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?