Watkins v. Investment Retrievers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Reginald Watkins
Defendant: Investment Retrievers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01348
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2018 ORDERING that IRI motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as explainedabove, with leave to amend consistent with this order. (Becknal, R)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/6/2017 ACCORDINGLY Mr. Mandabach is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 11/17/2017 why he should not be sanctioned $250.00 for appearing in this action despite not being an attorney of record; the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this order on Mr. Mandabach on the address he has provided as a member of the bar of this court 3102 O Street, Suite 1, Sacramento, California 95816.(Reader, L) (cc: C. Mandabach, Esq.)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/30/17: Ms. Drake is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by November 3, 2017 why she should not be sanctioned $250.00 for failing to comply with local rules. (Kaminski, H)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/11/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by October 20, 2017 why counsel should not be sanctioned: (1) $250.00 for failing to appear personally on Octobe r 6, 2017; and (2) $250.00 for failing to meet and confer as required of counsel of record regarding the joint status report. The court defers the issuance of any orders to Mr. Mandabach or Ms. Drake pending receipt of Mr. Stieglitz's response to this order.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Investment Retrievers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Watkins
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Retrievers, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Gribbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?