Valero Refining Company California v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company

Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company California
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01350
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/19 GRANTING Plaintiff Valero Refining Company-California's Request to Seal Documents.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/28/19 DENYING 46 Application for Temporary Stay. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/14/18, ORDERING that the Pretrial Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/24/18, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/19/2018, supplemental expert disclosures due by 11/16/18, and the deadline for hearing on dispositive motions is 2/7/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/2018. (Becknal, R)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/22/2017 ORDERING PG&E shall file and serve any motion to dismiss Valero's Complaint by 8/21/2017 and notice any motion to dismiss for hearing on 10/5/2017; Valero shall file and serve any opposition to any motion to dismiss the Complaint by 9/14/2017; PG&E shall file and serve any reply to Valero's opposition by 9/28/2017.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valero Refining Company California v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company California
Represented By: John Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?