Morgunov v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Morgunov
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01363
Filed: July 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/20/18 AWARDING plaintiff attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $1800.00 and no costs. This Stipulation renders MOOT the 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Benson, A.)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/14/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 18 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 21 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED; This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with the order; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/7/2017 GRANTING 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases; the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal; within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to th e USM a completed summons, a completed USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process in accordance with FRCP 4(i), and sufficient copies of the Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment is sued in this case; within 5 days after submitting the necessary documents to the USM for service or process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the USM; the USM is directed to serve process and copies of the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgunov v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Morgunov
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?