Ransom, et al., v. Volunteers of America Gretchen Angele
Plaintiff: Clinton Ransom and Christina Greer
Defendant: Volunteers of America Gretchen Angele
Case Number: 2:2017cv01437
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/13/17, ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; REFERRING this matter to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen days. (Michel, G.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/18/17 ORDERING that plaintiffs' 2 3 Motions to Proceed IFP are GRANTED; by 08/01/17, plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom, et al., v. Volunteers of America Gretchen Angele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteers of America Gretchen Angele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?