Stricklen et al v. Bayview Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Eric Stricklen and Harriet Stricklen
Defendant: Bayview Servicing, Clear Recon Corp. and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 2:2017cv01446
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/28/2017 EXTENDING time until 12/21/2017, for Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon, to respond to 1 Complaint. (York, M)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/25/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 17 Stipulation, the last day for Defendants Bayview LoanServicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED to 11/21/17. (Benson, A.)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/23/2017 ORDERING that the last day for Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon, to respond to the Complaint is CONTINUED to 9/21/2017. (Reader, L)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/07/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 10 request to file electronically is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/20/2017 DENYING 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's 8 Amended Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions is REFERRED to the Assigned Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Donati, J)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/13/2017 DENYING 2 Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklen et al v. Bayview Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stricklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Stricklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Servicing
Represented By: Michael W. Carruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Michael W. Carruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?