Ramos v. Los Rios Community College District
Plaintiff: Angela Ramos
Defendant: Los Rios Community College District and Thomas Kloster
Case Number: 2:2017cv01458
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/6/18 REMANDING this case to Superior Court of the State of California in and for the County of Sacramento. All pending dates before this court are hereby VACATED. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/3/2018 GRANTING 49 Request for Telephonic Appearance at the 11/13/2018 Hearing re 46 Motion to Remand. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (York, M)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/29/2018. (Hunt, G)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/16/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff be allowed to file First Amended Complaint. (Hunt, G)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/2018: IT IS ORDERED that 4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's state law claims under the California Equity in Higher Education Act, Cal. Educ. Code § 66270; California Civil Code § 51.9; negligence; and intentional infliction of emotional distress claims (Docket No. 4) be, and the same hereby is GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a First Amended Complaint, if she can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/17/2017 DENYING 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/10/2017 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 2/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 1/29/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/1/2017 GRANTING 10 Request to Redact 9 Declaration of Elana Jacobs. (Donati, J)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/4/2017 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 4 Motion to Dismiss to 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; ORDERING the plaintiff to file and serve an Opposition to said motion by 8/28/2017; ORDERING the defendant to file and serve its Reply by 9/11/2017. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Los Rios Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ramos
Represented By: Elana Rachel Jacobs
Represented By: Alexis Susann McKenna, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Rios Community College District
Represented By: Alesa M. Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?