Nutrition Distribution, LLC v. Enhanced Athlete, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nutrition Distribution, LLC
Defendant: Enhanced Athlete, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01491
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/2018 DENYING 85 without prejudice subject to renewal, motion to compel compliance with the subpoena of nonparties; GRANTING 86 , 89 motions to compel the 30(b)(6) deposition of defendants and for sanctions; Defendants shall pay plaintiff $1,495 for the attorney's fees incurred in bringing this motion; GRANTING 87 , 88 Motions for leave to take the deposition of incarcerated defendant Scott Cavell. (Reader, L)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 76 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Sanctions signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/18. (Kastilahn, A)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 CONSENT ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2018 GRANTING substitution of attorney Richard N. Grey for Michael Adams, Damon Mircheff and Brian Berggren. Rutan and Tucker, LLP and attorneys Michael Adams, Damon Mircheff and Brian Berggren terminated. (Hunt, G)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/16/2018 ORDERING that On 5/29/2018, beginning at 9:00 a.m., Anthony Hughes SHALL BE DEPOSED in person in Los Angeles, California, at a location to be determined and noticed by Mr. Tauler, unless the parties mutually stipulate to a different date, time, and location certain. (Hunt, G)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/9/2018 DENYING 62 Motion to Stay Discovery and GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 63 Motion to Compel. Within 14 days of this order, defendants shall produce documents and supplemental responses to plaintiffs first set of requests for production of documents and first set of special interrogatories. (Hunt, G)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 61 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/9/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/2018 GRANTING 36 Motion to Compel. Enhanced Athlete shall produce Anthony Hughes for a deposition, within 60 days of the date of this order. The court reserves judgement as to whe ther or not the statements of Anthony Hughes will bind Enhanced Athlete at trial. The 42 requests for sanctions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The 45 evidentiary objections to the declaration of Robert Tauler are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and 50 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. This order also disposes of improperly filed and redundant 41 Motion to Compel. (York, M)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/29/2017 ORDERING that Nutrition Distribution may file the proposed first amended complaint included with its motion [dkt no. 24-1] on or after January 5, 2018, but by no later than January 8, 2018.(Becknal, R)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/29/2017 ORDERING Proposed First Amended Complaint included with its motion 24 on or after 1/5/2018, but no later than 1/8/2018. (Reader, L)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/10/17 ORDERING that Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery 9 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 5 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/16/17 ORDERING that in the event the settlement discussions are not successful, DEFENDANTS response to the COMPLAINT will be due on September 13, 2017.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrition Distribution, LLC v. Enhanced Athlete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrition Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Robert Tauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Athlete, Inc.
Represented By: Judith L. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?