Deljuan Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Loren Maurice Deljuan Jones
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01503
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/06/18 for failure to prosecute and comply with court orders. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/14/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, within fourteen days of the date of this order, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file a Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file his Motion for Summary Judgment within fourteen days of the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/2017 GRANTING 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigneds scheduling order in Social Security cases; the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal; Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM; an original and five copies each of the completed summons, copies of the complaint, and copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM; the USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/17: Plaintiff is directed to file, within fourteen days of this order, a further affidavit which is dated and signed under penalty of perjury. The court will then resume consideration of plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deljuan Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Maurice Deljuan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?