Carr v. AutoNation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Carr
Defendant: AutoNation, Inc., Jeffrey Davis, Wayne Huizenga and LKQ Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01539
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/22/2019 DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff shall take and recover nothing in this action from Defendants. (Zignago, K.)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/18 DENYING Defendant Autonation's Motion to Certify Order on Motion to Dismiss as Interlocutory Appeal. (Becknal, R)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/2018 GRANTING 39 AutoNation, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and DISMISSES Plaintiff's sole remaining claim of breach of contract implied in fact with LEAVE TO AMEND. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/5/18 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. (Kaminski, H)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/3/2018 GRANTING LKQ's 23 motion to dismiss Plaintiff's trade secret misappropriation claim with leave to amend. Should Plaintiff elect to file a First Amended Complaint against LKQ for trade secret misappropriation, he must do so within twenty (20) days of this order. Defendant's responsive pleading to a First Amended Complaint is due twenty (20) days thereafter. (Becknal, R)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/19/17 ORDERING that Defendants Wayne Huizenga and Jeffrey Davis are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the terms of the foregoing stipulation. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/14/2017 ORDERING that Defendants' shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 9/20/2017. (Reader, L)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/7/2017 ORDERING that Defendant's AutoNation, Inc., Jeffrey Davis, and Wayne Huizenga response to the complaint is EXTENDED to 9/15/2017. (Reader, L)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/17/17 ORDERING that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff Carr's complaint is EXTENDED by 21 days and Defendants' new response deadline is 9/12/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. AutoNation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carr
Represented By: Kevin A. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoNation, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Kassner Christa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Davis
Represented By: Laura Kassner Christa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Huizenga
Represented By: Laura Kassner Christa
Represented By: Melissa Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKQ Corporation
Represented By: Lonnie D. Giamela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?