Crisp v. Barretto et al
Plaintiff: |
Obie L. Crisp, III |
Defendant: |
J. Barretto, A. Ladson, Jimminez and M. Martel |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01577 |
Filed: |
June 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Deborah Barnes |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 6, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2018 ORDERING that the 10 Objections to the findings and recommendations are deemed timely filed. The 9 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiffs claims regarding the process involved in denying him a funeral pass, regarding the prisons appeals process, seeking damages for emotional distress, and seeking injunctive relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Hunt, G)
|
March 21, 2018 |
Filing
9
AMENDED ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/20/2018 ORDERING the 3/7/2018 Order, Findings and Recommendations 8 is VACATED. The court's 8/29/2017 order 6 dismissing this action is VACATED and the Clerk shall REOPEN this case. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend in accordance with this order, within 30 days. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims regarding the process involved in denying him a funeral pass, regarding the prison's appeals process, seeking damages for emotional distress, and seeking injunctive relief be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
March 7, 2018 |
Filing
8
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/6/2018 ORDERING the court's 8/29/2017 order dismissing this action is VACATED and the Clerk shall reopen this case. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED wit h leave to amend in accordance with this order, within 30 days. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims regarding the process involved in denying him a funeral pass, regarding the prison's appeals process, seeking damages for emotional distress, and seeking injunctive relief be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. 7 Motion for Reconsideration terminated. (Yin, K)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/28/2017 ORDERING this action DISMISSED pursuant to FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?