Brown v. Baughman
Plaintiff: |
William Brown |
Defendant: |
Baughman, Abel Meirelles, R. Cross and R. Kendall |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01623 |
Filed: |
August 4, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2020 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/19/2020 ADOPTING 27 Findings and Recommendations in full and DISMISSING plaintiff's 26 First Amended Complaint without leave to amend for failure to state a cognizable claim. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
|
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/12/2020 ADOPTING in full 19 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING plaintiff's 15 Motion for Injunctive Relief. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 11, 2020 |
Filing
27
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/10/20 DENYING 24 Motion to Proceed IFP. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's first amended complaint 26 be dismissed without leave to amend for failure to state a cognizable claim. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 23, 2019 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/19. Plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 12, 2019 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/11/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of William Brown. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
|
October 15, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/15/18 VACATING 6 Order and 7 Judgment, REOPENING this case and DIRECTING the clerk to randomly assign a district judge. Kimberly J. Mueller added. It is h ereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendation. New Case Number: 2:17-cv-1623-KJM-EFB (PC). (Coll, A)
|
November 16, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/17 ORDERING after this civil rights action was closed and judgment duly entered, plaintiff filed a motion to file a supplemental complaint 8 . The court takes no action on plaintiffs filin g as this case is now closed. Plaintiff is hereby informed that the court will not respond to future filings in this action that are not authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Plummer, M) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Plummer, M).
|
October 26, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
|
August 14, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/11/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a) within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?