Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al

Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01632
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for EXONERATION OF CASH BOND and Disposition of Seized Merchandise signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/21/2017. cc: Financial.(Kirksey Smith, K)
August 15, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 REQUEST to Appear Telephonically signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/14/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 10, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, SEIZURE ORDER, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/10/2017 GRANTING 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. This order be and is hereby conditioned upon plaintiff� 39;s filing with the Clerk of this Court an undertaking in the form of a bond, certified check, bank check, credit card or cash in the amount of $10,000 no later than the close of business on 8/14/2017. Hearing re 3 Order to Show Cause on Pre liminary Injunction is set for 8/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Defendants' responsive papers, if any, shall be filed with the Clerk of this Court and served upon the attorneys for plaintiff by de livering copies to its counsel on or before 8/18/2017. Any reply shall be filed by plaintiff and served upon each appearing defendant or his/her counsel on or before 9/20/2017. Plaintiff is to provide copies of all other filed pleadings at the request of any identified defendant. [See document for further details.] cc: Financial. (Kirksey Smith, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cara Rebecca Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?