Kreis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Toni A Kreis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01633
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/27/19 AWARDING plaintiff attorney's fees under EAJA in the amount of $7,000.00 subject to the terms of the stipulation. (Coll, A)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/7/19 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 14 be granted; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment 19 be denied and the Commissioner's final decision be reversed and this matter be remanded for further proceedings consistent with these findings and recommendations. F&R referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Kaminski, H)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/31/18, ORDERING that defendant's 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DEEMED timely. (Kastilahn, A)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/15/18 ORDERING that Defendant shall have an extension of time of 14 additional days to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. The new due date will be 5/29/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/8/18: Plaintiff's time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment/Remand is hereby extended to the new due date of April 12, 2018.(Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/5/2017 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order onthe United States Marshal; Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM; the USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni A Kreis
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?