Audi AG, et al v. TCB Imports, et al.,
Plaintiff: Audi AG, Bentley Motors Limited and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Defendant: TCB Imports and Todd C. Benson
Case Number: 2:2017cv01660
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/11/17: Initial Scheduling Conference is ADVANCED to 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/11/17 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until 10/2/17, to file an answer to the Complaint. Defendants shall have until 10/6/17, to respond to or otherwise oppose Audi's an d Bentley's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Audi and Bentley shall have until 10/13/17, to file a reply to any such opposition to Audi's and Bentley's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by the defendants; and The hearing on Audi's and Bentley's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 8 scheduled for 9/22/17, shall be CONTINUED to 10/20/17, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before JudgeKimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/2017. Added attorney Jason P. Eves, PHV for Audi AG, Bentley Motors Limited, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audi AG, et al v. TCB Imports, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audi AG
Represented By: Stephen L. Davis
Represented By: Jason P. Eves, PHV
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bentley Motors Limited
Represented By: Stephen L. Davis
Represented By: Jason P. Eves, PHV
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen L. Davis
Represented By: Jason P. Eves, PHV
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCB Imports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?