Audi AG, et al v. TCB Imports, et al.,
Plaintiff: |
Audi AG, Bentley Motors Limited and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. |
Defendant: |
TCB Imports and Todd C. Benson |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01660 |
Filed: |
August 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 11, 2017 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/11/17: Initial Scheduling Conference is ADVANCED to 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/11/17 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until 10/2/17, to file an answer to the Complaint. Defendants shall have until 10/6/17, to respond to or otherwise oppose Audi's an d Bentley's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Audi and Bentley shall have until 10/13/17, to file a reply to any such opposition to Audi's and Bentley's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by the defendants; and The hearing on Audi's and Bentley's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 8 scheduled for 9/22/17, shall be CONTINUED to 10/20/17, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before JudgeKimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
11
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/2017. Added attorney Jason P. Eves, PHV for Audi AG, Bentley Motors Limited, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., (Washington, S)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Audi AG, et al v. TCB Imports, et al., |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Audi AG |
Represented By: |
Stephen L. Davis |
Represented By: |
Jason P. Eves, PHV |
Represented By: |
Gregory D. Phillips, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bentley Motors Limited |
Represented By: |
Stephen L. Davis |
Represented By: |
Jason P. Eves, PHV |
Represented By: |
Gregory D. Phillips, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Stephen L. Davis |
Represented By: |
Jason P. Eves, PHV |
Represented By: |
Gregory D. Phillips, PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TCB Imports |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Todd C. Benson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?