Bangert v. County of Placer et al

Plaintiff: Beau Bangert
Defendant: County of Placer, Placer County Sheriff's Office, Devon M. Bell, Robert L. Madden and Megan C. Yaws
Case Number: 2:2017cv01667
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/26/18, ORDERING that the action denominated 2:18-cv-00026-MCE-GGH, is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:18-cv-00026-TLN-KJN. (Kastilahn, A)
March 26, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/26/18 ORDERING that all parties shall abide by the terms of the stipulated protective order filed 3/12/18. (Plummer, M)
March 12, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/12/2018 ORDERING within 14 days, counsel representing plaintiff in this action shall inform the court whether plaintiff will attend the settlement conference; counsel shall also inform the court whether plaintiff attending the conference is incarcerated, and if so, provide information regarding where plaintiff is incarcerated. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/17 ORDERING that Within fourteen days of the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff in 17- cv-1667 and counsel for defendants in the above-entitled cases shall inform the court whether they have any opposition to relating these cases. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the instant order on all counsel in the above entitled cases. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/28/2017 EXTENDING time to respond to the complaint. Defendants shall have until 11/2/2017 to respond to plaintiff's complaint.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bangert v. County of Placer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Bangert
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Placer
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon M. Bell
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Madden
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan C. Yaws
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?