Culbertson-Chavira v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Culbertson-Chavira
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2017cv01702
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/3/18 ORDERING pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action hereby is DISMISSED in its entirety, as to all parties, and with prejudice; Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2018 denying 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. The parties are directed to file a stipulation dismissing this action or, in the alternative, a joint status report informing the Court as to how they wish to proceed with this case within ten days of the date of this Order. (Washington, S)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/12/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs shall be filed on 5/15/2018 and noticed for hearing on 6/19/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion shall be filed 6/5/2018. Plaintiff's reply to opposition to the Motion shall be filed 6/12/2018. (Zignago, K.)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/11/17: This matter is stayed pending the submission by Plaintiff of an administrative appeal. (Kaminski, H)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/1/2017 ORDERING defendant Community Memorial Health System Employee Benefit Plan be DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson-Chavira v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Culbertson-Chavira
Represented By: Michael Brian Horrow
Represented By: Nichole D. Podgurski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Represented By: Allison Vana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?