Nevada Fleet LLC v. Fedex Corporation
Plaintiff: Nevada Fleet LLC
Defendant: Fedex Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, ARI, INC. and Automotive Rentals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01732
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 112 MOTION to DISMISS by Automotive Rentals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Becker, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION to DISMISS by Federal Express Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Becker, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 110 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (Kastilahn, A)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/20/21 GRANTING #105 Defendant Federal Express Corporation's Request to Seal. Defendant Federal Express Corporation may file under seal the identified portions of its Motion to Dismiss and supporting Exhibits; and Defendant Federal Express Corporation will file a redacted version of its Motion to Dismiss on the public docket. (Kastilahn, A)
August 20, 2021 Filing 108 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (Kastilahn, A)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/20/21 GRANTING #106 Defendant Automotive Rentals, Inc.'s ("ARI") Request to Seal. Defendant ARI may file under seal the identified portions of its Motion to Dismiss and attached Exhibit; and Defendant ARI will file a redacted version of its Motion to Dismiss on the public docket. (Kastilahn, A)
August 18, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Automotive Rentals, Inc.. (Becker, Ryan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Federal Express Corporation. (Becker, Ryan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 104 REDACTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nevada Fleet LLC.(Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Huang, H).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/30/21 GRANTING #97 Request to Seal. Plaintiff is directed to promptly file the proposed redacted Second Amended Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
July 23, 2021 Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy K. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/23/2021: The Court hereby APPROVES the parties' Stipulation (ECF No. #101 ) as follows: Defendants shall have until 8/18/2021 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Any motions to dismiss shall be noticed according the Court's available law and motion dates found on the Court's website. All briefing shall then be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c) and (d). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 23, 2021 Filing 101 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Automotive Rentals, Inc., Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Becker, Ryan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ryan T. Becker, PHV on behalf of Automotive Rentals, Inc.. Attorney Becker, Ryan T. added. (Becker, Ryan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Dwight Craig Donovan on behalf of Automotive Rentals, Inc.. Attorney Donovan, Dwight Craig added. (Donovan, Dwight)
July 21, 2021 Filing 98 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: ARI, INC. served on 7/15/2021. (Fernald, Brandon)
July 20, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon)
July 14, 2021 Filing 96 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *ARI, INC., Federal Express Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brandon Claus Fernald* *Fernald Law Group APC* *15910 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1702* *Los Angeles, CA 91436*. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2021 Filing 95 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Express Corporation, ARI, INC. by Nevada Fleet LLC.(Fernald, Brandon)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/9/2021 GRANTING #93 Ex Parte Application. Plaintiff Nevada Fleet, LLC's deadline to file an amended complaint is set for Monday 7/12/2021. Per the Court's Order dated 6/9/2021, Defendants' responsive pleading is due twenty-one (21) days after Plaintiff files an amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 93 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Nevada Fleet LLC for Clarification/Extension. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon)
June 11, 2021 Filing 92 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Dwight Craig Donovan for Federal Express Corporation and Fedex Corporation, attorney Jaemin Chang terminated. (Donovan, Dwight) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Zignago, K.).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/9/2021 GRANTING #36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings against FedEx and FedEx Express with leave to amend as to Claims One through Five, Eleven through Fifteen, Seventeen, and Eighteen and without leave to amend as to Claims Six through Ten and Sixteen. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 30 days and defendants' responsive pleading is due within 21 days thereafter. (Coll, A)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/10/21 AMENDING #81 Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery shall be completed by 10/8/2021. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/8/2021. Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 3/24/2022. All other deadlines in the June 18, 2018 Scheduling Order remain intact. (Kaminski, H)
June 9, 2021 Filing 89 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Becker, Ryan)
June 9, 2021 Filing 88 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Federal Express Corporation. (Becker, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2021 APPROVING the parties' Stipulation (ECF No. #86 ) as follows: The deadlines set forth in the 6/18/2018 Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #33 ) as subsequently amended are hereby STAYED for a period of 60 days from the date of this Order for the purpose of facilitating a second mediation between the parties. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 90 days from the date of this Order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 10, 2021 Filing 86 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/13/21 ORDERING that defendants' objections to plaintiff's request for production no. 2 (third set) are OVERRULED. Defendants shall produce documents responsive to this discovery request, to the extent defendants possess such documents. The court SUSTAINS defendants' objection to request for production no. 4 on proportionality grounds. Plaintiff's motion to compel on this discovery request is DENIED at this time. This denial is without prejudice, and so plaintiff may re-raise this argument later, if necessary. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2021 Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/2021: At the request of parties, the parties shall inform the court if the tentative ruling previously issued on 1/8/2021 (see ECF No. 83) satisfies this discovery dispute by noon, Wednesday, January 13, 2021. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
January 8, 2021 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/8/2021: The court is in receipt of the parties' joint statement re: discovery disagreement, currently set for a January 14, 2021 hearing. (ECF No. #82 .) The hearing is VACATED, and the court now issues the following tentative ruling: 1.Plaintiff's arguments to compel documents responsive to the request for production no. 2 are well taken, and the court is inclined to order production of documents on the 142 vehicles purchased by plaintiff (to the extent defendants possess such documents).2.Defendants' proportionality argument regarding request for production no. 4 is well taken, and the court is inclined to deny production of documents on the 1,611 vehicles at this time. This denial would be without prejudice, and so could be re-raised (if necessary) after plaintiff has had time to review defendants' responses to RPD2 and consider its ability to proffer its intent- and pattern- arguments using the documents produced in RPD2.Counsel shall review the court's tentative ruling and confer with opposing counsel. By the close of business on Monday, January 11, 2021, the parties shall inform the court if this tentative ruling satisfies this discovery dispute. If so, the court will issue the tentative ruling as a signed order. If not, the court will entertain further arguments at a rescheduled hearing (without need for further briefing)which would occur on Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
January 7, 2021 Filing 82 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiff Nevada Fleet LLC re #79 Motion to Compel. (Fernald, Brandon)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/28/20 GRANTING #80 Stipulation; all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 03/19/21. All other deadlines in the 06/18/2018 Scheduling Order remain intact. (Benson, A.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 80 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for MODIFICATION of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 12/28/2020 (Krueger, M).
December 22, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to COMPEL Further Responses to Nevada Fleet, LLC's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Nevada Fleet LLC. Motion Hearing SET for 1/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 12/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 22, 2020 Filing 78 REPLY by Nevada Fleet LLC in support of #76 Ex Parte Application. (Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 12/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 21, 2020 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation to #76 Ex Parte Application. (Becker, Ryan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 76 EX PARTE APPLICATION to MODIFY Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 12/22/2020 (Benson, A.).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/25/2020 MODIFYING the pretrial scheduling order as follows: Discovery shall be completed by 1/19/2021, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/19/2021, Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 8/19/2021. (Kastilahn, A)
August 25, 2020 Filing 74 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of Pretrial Scheduling Order by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon) Modified on 8/26/2020 (Huang, H).
August 18, 2020 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/18/2020: Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal (ECF No. #72 ), Attorney Joshua A. Hills is hereby removed and Attorney Craig Lindberg will remain as counsel. The Motion to Withdraw Attorney (ECF No. #71 ) is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 18, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Campbell, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 71 UNOPPOSED MOTION to WITHDRAW Joshua A. Hillis as ATTORNEY by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. Attorney Campbell, John W. added. (Campbell, John) Modified on 8/18/2020 (York, M).
August 13, 2020 Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/13/2020: In light of the Order for Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. #69 ), Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Attorney (ECF No. #69 ) is hereby DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/12/2020 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Brandon Claus Fernald as counsel of record in place of Attorney Mary Kathleen Gallagher to represent Nevada Fleet LLC. (York, M)
August 12, 2020 Filing 68 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Fernald, Brandon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/15/2020: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (ECF No. #65 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 7/23/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Plaintiff may still file a reply in accordance with Local Rule 230(d) and the 7/23/2020 date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 9, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation to #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Becker, Ryan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 65 AMENDED #63 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY to Plaintiff by Nevada Fleet LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Mary)
June 23, 2020 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/23/2020: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Attorney (ECF No. #63 ). The Motion as filed is deficient and Plaintiff is directed to renotice the Motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(b). Accordingly, the 7/9/2020 hearing date is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 22, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY for Plaintiff by Nevada Fleet LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Mary)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRO HAC VICE ORDERsigned by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/29/20: Added attorney John W. Campbell, PHV for Fedex Corporation. (Kaminski, H)
May 19, 2020 Filing 61 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Fedex Corporation for attorney John W. Campbell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8898021) (Attachments: #1 Statement Certificate of Good Standing)(Lindberg, Craig)
May 4, 2020 Filing 60 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE: ADDED Attorney Mary Gallagher for Nevada Fleet LLC and TERMED Attorney Tanya Kim Harris. (Gallagher, Mary) Modified on 5/5/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/1/2020 AMENDING the #57 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery shall be completed by 9/30/2020; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/13/2020; Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 5/27/2021. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amendment of Discovery Deadlines by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Becker, Ryan)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/6/2020 ORDERING All Discovery with the exception of expert discovery shall be completed by 6/29/2020. Disclosures of Expert Witnesses due by 8/3/2020, and all dispositive Motions shall be heard by 3/4/2021.(Reader, L)
February 6, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amendment to Scheduling Order by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Mary)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/25/19 AMENDING #53 Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery shall be completed by 2/28/2020. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 10/29/2020. (Kaminski, H)
November 25, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/17/19 AMENDING the #49 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/13/19. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/18/20. Dispositive Motions heard by 6/25/20. (Coll, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Amend #49 Scheduling Order by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua) Modified on 9/18/2019 (Becknal, R).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/22/19 ADDING Attorney Ryan T. Becker, PHV for Federal Express Corporation. (Kastilahn, A)
July 22, 2019 Filing 50 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Federal Express Corporation for attorney Ryan T. Becker to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Chang, Jaemin added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8369039) (Chang, Jaemin) Modified on 7/22/2019 (Coll, A).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/15/19 AMENDING #47 Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery shall be completed by October 10/18/19. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/18/19. Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 4/30/20. (Kaminski, H)
July 15, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order for Good Cause re #47 Order by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua) Modified on 7/16/2019 (Kaminski, H).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/18/2019 AMENDING #33 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery shall be completed by 8/15/2019, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/11/2019, Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 2/20/2020, and the parties will engage in a 1 day mediation on or before 9/13/2019 with a private mediator. All other deadlines established in the #33 Pretrial Scheduling Order remain intact. (Huang, H)
January 17, 2019 Filing 46 [DISREGARD - DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NO. #45 ] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amending Scheduling Order for Good Cause re #33 Scheduling Order, by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gallagher, Mary) Modified on 1/18/2019 (Krueger, M).
January 17, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order for Good Cause by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Mary) Modified on 1/18/2019 (Krueger, M).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2018 DENYING #43 Request for Status Conference. (Washington, S)
November 30, 2018 Filing 43 REQUEST for Status Conference by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Hills, Joshua) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 27, 2018 Filing 42 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Federal Express Corporation to Respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and First Requests for Admissions by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Hills, Joshua)
September 13, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation to #39 Opposition to Motion. (Hills, Joshua) Modified on 9/13/2018 (Kaminski, H).
September 10, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2018: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. #36 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 9/20/018 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Defendants may still file a Reply Brief in accordance with Local Rule 230(d) and the 9/20/2018 date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 6, 2018 Filing 39 OPPOSITION by Nevada Fleet LLC to #36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Harris, Tanya)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/2018. (Zignago, K.)
August 8, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hills, Joshua) Modified on 8/10/2018 (Washington, S).
July 30, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the PLEADINGS by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua) Modified on 7/30/2018 (Krueger, M).
June 26, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/26/2018: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (ECF No. #34 ). The Court hereby GRANTS an extension of page limits for the following amounts: the motion may not exceed thirty (30) pages, the opposition may not exceed thirty (30) pages, and the reply may not exceed fifteen (15) pages. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 26, 2018 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for LEAVE to Exceed Page Limit for Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua) Modified on 6/28/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2018 ORDERING all Discovery shall be completed by 2/15/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/11/2019. All Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 8/8/2019. (Zignago, K.)
June 15, 2018 Filing 32 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Harris, Tanya)
May 11, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation.(Hills, Joshua)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until 5/11/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
May 1, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Answer First Amended Complaint by Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporation. Attorney Hills, Joshua A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hills, Joshua)
April 18, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Federal Express Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya Kim Harris* *Gallagher Jones LLP* *2945 Ramco Street, Suite 110* *West Sacramento, CA 95691-5998*. (Becknal, R)
April 17, 2018 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Harris, Tanya)
April 17, 2018 Filing 26 [DISREGARD- SEE #27 First Amended Complaint] EXHIBIT I by Nevada Fleet LLC re #24 Amended Complaint, #25 Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O, #7 Exhibit P, #8 Exhibit Q)(Harris, Tanya) Modified on 4/17/2018 (Donati, J).
April 17, 2018 Filing 25 [DISREGARD- SEE #27 First Amended Complaint] EXHIBIT B by Nevada Fleet LLC re #24 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H)(Harris, Tanya) Modified on 4/17/2018 (Donati, J).
April 17, 2018 Filing 24 [DISREGARD- SEE #27 First Amended Complaint] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Tanya) Modified on 4/17/2018 (Donati, J).
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE ORDERsigned by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/10/18. Added Attorney Joshua Hills, PHV for Fedex Corporation. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 10, 2018 Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Fedex Corporation for attorney Joshua A. Hillis to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7599787) (Attachments: #1 ertificate of Good Standing)(Lindberg, Craig)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/9/18, GRANTING Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
February 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL by Fedex Corporation. (Askew, Graham)
February 9, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2018: In reviewing Defendant's Response to the Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF No. #16 ), the Court hereby DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 15). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 9, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2018: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 2/22/018 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Defendant's request to appear telephonically (ECF No. #17 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 9, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 2/22/2018 Motion hearing by Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Askew, Graham)
February 5, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Fedex Corporation to #11 Motion to Amend Complaint. (Askew, Graham)
January 26, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/26/2018 ORDERING the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) CONTINUED to 2/22/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Counsel for Defendant is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 2/8/2018, as to why they should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to that motion, pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). Defendant shall file an opposition to the motion, or statement of non-opposition by 2/8/2018. Failure to file an opposition to the motion will be deemed a statement of non-opposition thereto, and may result in a recommendation that Plaintiff's motion be granted. Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendant's opposition, if any, by 2/15/2018. Defendant's request for telephonic appearance (ECF No. #14 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
January 10, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 2/8/2018 Motion hearing by Fedex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Askew, Graham)
December 29, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #11 Motion to Amend Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Harris, Tanya) Modified on 1/2/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
December 29, 2017 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/29/2017: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF No. #11 ). The Motion as filed is deficient and the Plaintiff is directed to renotice the Motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(b). Accordingly, the 1/25/2018 hearing date is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 29, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Complaint, by Nevada Fleet LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Kathleen Gallagher)(Harris, Tanya) Modified on 1/2/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
October 27, 2017 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Nevada Fleet LLC. Attorney Harris, Tanya Kim added. (Harris, Tanya) Modified on 10/30/2017 (Krueger, M).
October 12, 2017 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Fedex Corporation. (Askew, Graham)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/5/17: Added attorney Graham W Askew, PHV for Fedex Corporation. (Kaminski, H)
September 29, 2017 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Fedex Corporation for attorney Graham W. Askew to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7289062) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lindberg, Craig)
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER by Fedex Corporation. Attorney Lindberg, Craig E added.(Lindberg, Craig)
September 11, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fedex Corporation served on 8/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Gallagher, Mary)
August 21, 2017 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fedex Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary Kathleen Gallagher* *Gallagher Jones LLP* *2945 Ramco Street, Suite 110* *Sacramento, CA 95691*. (Kastilahn, A)
August 18, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nevada Fleet LLC (Gallagher, Mary)
August 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nevada Fleet LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7219947) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gallagher, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Fleet LLC v. Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Represented By: John W. Campbell, PHV
Represented By: Craig E Lindberg
Represented By: Joshua A. Hills, PHV
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Graham W Askew, PHV
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Craig E Lindberg
Represented By: Joshua A. Hills, PHV
Represented By: Ryan T. Becker, PHV
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: John W. Campbell, PHV
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARI, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Becker, PHV
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Fleet LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathleen Gallagher
Represented By: Tanya Kim Harris
Represented By: Brandon Claus Fernald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?