McElroy v. CHCF Chief Classifications Services et al
Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Defendant: CHCF Chief Classifications Services, Wancewicz, HC Panel, CHCF Committee Board and J. Rourke
Case Number: 2:2017cv01739
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/6/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2017 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit within 21 days, the appropriate filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. 7 , 11 motions terminated.(Yin, K)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/31/17 ordering plaintiff's motion 3 is denied. Plaintiffs completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis shall be filed on or before September 29, 2017. (Plummer, M)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to submit the filing fee of $400 or a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days from the date of this order. Clerk to send a new IFP application to plaintiff. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy v. CHCF Chief Classifications Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHCF Chief Classifications Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wancewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HC Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHCF Committee Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?