Ngo v. Seibel
Plaintiff: Ky Ngo
Defendant: K Seibel
Case Number: 2:2017cv01815
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/10/2019 RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; and this court decline to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/20/2017 DENYING as moot petitioner's 11 motion for an extension of time to file objections and WITHDRAWING the 11/29/2017 findings and recommendations 10 . Petitioner has 30 days to file a response to the 9/5/2017 order to show cause.(Yin, K)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/29/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/2017 GRANTING 8 Request for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file a response to the 9/5/2017 order to show cause within 30 days from service of this order. (Hunt, G)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/1/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING petitioner to show cause why his petition should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction within 30 days of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/30/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from cand on 8/31/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ngo v. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ky Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?