Bradley v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lawrence Bradley
Defendant: Jeffrey Miller, Kari Strawn, Arturo Reyes and Maryanne Gilliard
Case Number: 2:2017cv01834
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/30/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is REVOKED. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals) (Washington, S)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff's tardy 14 objections to the already-adopted findings and recommendations are OVERRULED as untimely. Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Proceed IFP on appeal is DENIED AS MOOT, because plaintiff has already been granted in forma pauperis status on 10/27/2017, which continues automatically on appeal. No further motions will be entertained in this already-closed case. (Zignago, K.)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/8/2017 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 7 second amended complaint be dismissed without further leave to amend; the action be dismissed with prejudice; the Clerk of Court be directed to close the case; Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's; IT IS ALSO HEREBY ORDERED that all pleading, discovery and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of those F & R's. (Reader, L)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/27/2017 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP; Plaintiff's first amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; within 28 days of this order, plaintiff shall file either a second amended complaint in compliance with this order or a request for voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lawrence Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryanne Gilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?