Evans v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Evans
Defendant: Harrison
Case Number: 2:2017cv01888
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/02/19 ORDERING This civil rights action was closed on August 8, 2019, after the parties filed a stipulation for voluntary dismissal of the case following settlement. See ECF Nos. 60 , 61 . Plaintiff is advised that documents he has filed since the closing date will be disregarded and no orders will issue in response to future filings.(Plummer, M)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/26/19 DENYING 49 plaintiff's request for single cell status. (Plummer, M)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/06/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Richard Anthony Evans on 8/07/19 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/3/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 44 motion for reconsideration. (Yin, K)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/21/19 DENYING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/08/19 DENYING 35 Motion for federal protection; DENYING 37 request for records; and DENYING 38 Motion to obtain personal laptop containing evidence. The clerk of court shall send plaintif f a copy of the court's order referring case to post-screening ADR project, issued 4/01/19 27 . Upon receipt of this order, plaintiff shall immediately fill out and return to the court the Notice Re: Plaintiffs Appearance at Settlement Conference (Post-Screening ADR Project).See ECF No. 27 at 4. (Plummer, M)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/24/2019 DENYING as improper 32 Motion for Subpoenas and 33 Motion to Change Defendant's Counsel and ORDERING Plaintiff to file the Notice Re: Plaintiff's Appearance at Settlement Conference by the date given in 27 Order. (Henshaw, R)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/18/2019 DENYING 30 Plaintiff's 4/15/2019 Motion. (Henshaw, R)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/1/2019. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall file the attached notice informing the court how he wishes to appear at the settl ement conference. The parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the settlement conference in accordance with this order. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) (Yin, K)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/15/2018 DENYING as moot 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases and DENYING as deficient 17 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff to return the attached form within 14 days of the service date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Richard Evans signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/18/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?