Smith Winston v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Angeleka M. Smith Winston
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01901
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/19/18, ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's motion for summary judgment is 7/3/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
June 14, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/13/2018; Defendant to show cause in writing, within 14 days, why its failure to file a MSJ should not be deemed a statement of non-opposition to Plaintiff's Motion. (Fabillaran, J)
May 2, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for first extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/1/18. Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to file her Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 20, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/20/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff may have an extension of time to and including 4/18/2018 in which to file a Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant may have an extension of time to 5/18/2018 to file an Opposition; any reply by Plaintiff is due by 6/8/2018. (Reader, L)
September 14, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/13/17 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING the Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Winston v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angeleka M. Smith Winston
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?