Mendez Jimenez v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Mendez Jimenez
Defendant: United States of America and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2017cv01914
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/14/2018 ORDERING 20 the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Amend with respect to his allegations against the U.S. and the individual ICE agents. The U.S. is DISMISSED with prejudice as a party to this action. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Amend with respect to his allegations against the County Defendants. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a modified Second Amended Complaint consistent with this Order within one week of the date of this Order. (Reader, L)
February 8, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/8/2018 ORDERING 16 the Court GRANTS with Prejudice the United States' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's FTCA claim predicated on the failure to provide medical care and actions by the County and County Officers. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/5/2018 RELATING CASE(S) 2:17-CV-1914 JAM KJN and 2:18-CV-44 TLN KJN REASSIGNING CASE 2:18-CV-44 to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings; any and all dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED; District Judge Troy L. Nunley no longer assigned to case 2:18-CV-44. New Case Number: 2:18-CV-44 JAM KJN. (Reader, L)
November 15, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/17 ORDERING that the parties' stipulation concurrently filed hereby becomes final and that the First Amended Complaint and Defendant County of Sacramento's Answer are deemed filed with the signing of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez Jimenez v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Mendez Jimenez
Represented By: Douglas L. Gordon
Represented By: Aida S. Macedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?