Gardner v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: |
Rondel Delbert Gardner |
Defendant: |
CDCR, J Bissett, Edmond Brown and Kreamer |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01921 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 18, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/18/2018 DENYING 42 Motion for Default Judgment. (Huang, H)
|
August 7, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/2018 DENYING 36 Motion for Judgment and Discovery; ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING 33 Second Amended Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/5/2018 DISMISSING plaintiff's first amended complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a complaint form.(Yin, K)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/01/18 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for miscellaneous relief 25 is GRANTED to the extent the court has clarified its responses to his previous request and is denied in all other respects. Plaintiff's motion to compel 26 is DENIED. (Plummer, M)
|
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Delbert Rondel Gardner signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/2018. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/03/17 DENYING 6 , 8 plaintiff's motions for the appointment of counsel and DENYING 10 plaintiff's motion for summons and service. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from service of this order to file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?