United States of America v. Clauer
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Bruce Clauer
Case Number: 2:2017cv01933
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment of Veteran's Benefits
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/21/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 24 are ADOPTED in FULL; the Clerk's 18 Entry of Default is VACATED and SET ASIDE; Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED; and Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint within 20 days from the date this Order is filed. (Reader, L)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2018 ORDERING the Court, having reviewed the court files and the parties' Stipulation Regarding Prejudgment Writ of Garnishment and finding good cause therefor, hereby APPROVES the Stipulation. (Becknal, R)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/2018 ORDERING Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 3/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Washington, S)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/27/17 Recommending that Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Default Judgment be DENIED. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to these F&Rs due within twenty-one days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/7/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff has seven (7) days from the date of this order to file a reply brief in support of 19 Motion for Default Judgment if they wish to do so. (Washington, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/15/2017 VACATING the 19 Motion Hearing. If defendant wishes to oppose plaintiffs motion for default judgment, he shall file a statement of opposition within 21 days of this order. The motion will be taken under submission upon expiration of defendants time to respond. The Clerk of Court shall serve this order on defendant, together with a courtesy copy of plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment. (Hunt, G)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/17, ORDERING that the Plaintiff United States' Ex Parte Application for Prejudgment Writ of Garnishment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to issue the Prejudgment Writs of Garnishment. Following issuance of the Prejudgment Writ of Garnishment by the Clerk and upon service thereof, Garnishee California Department of Corrections is ORDERED to freeze Defendant John Bruce Clauer's inmate trust account located at Mule Creek State Prison until furtherorder from this Court. Following issuance of the Writ of Garnishment by the Clerk and uponservice thereof, Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank is ORDERED to freeze Defendant John Bruce Clauer's accounts until further order from this Court. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Clauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patrick John Suter(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bruce Clauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?