Russo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cynthia Marie Russo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01957
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER for the award of Attorney fees signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/13/19. Payment of THREE THOUSAND, NINE HUNDRED SIXTY DOLLARS and 46/100 ($3,960.46) in EAJA attorney fees shall constitute a complete release from, and bar to, any and all claims that Plaintiff and Plaintiffs attorney, Jonathan O. Pea, may have relating to EAJA attorney fees in connection with this action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/20/2019 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and REMANDING the matter for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/28/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment within 7 days of the date this order is served. The Commissioner's Cross-Motion for MSJ is due 45 days thereafter. (Fabillaran, J)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/26/17 GRANTING the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court re the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Marie Russo
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ben A. Porter, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?