Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mike Green
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01992
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/23/19 ORDERING that MIKE GREEN is awarded attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $5,750.00 under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (Becknal, R)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/4/19 GRANTING 17 motion for summary judgment and DENYING cross-motion for summary judgment. This matter is REMANDED for additional administrative proceedings and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the plaintiff's favor. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/18: Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and file her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/21/2018 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is hereby EXTENDED to April 25, 2018. (Becknal, R)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE MOTION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/15/18 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment in the above-referenced case is hereby EXTENDED to the new filing date of 3/26/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/17: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted 2 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Green
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?