Taylor v. Arnold
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Taylor
Defendant: Eric Arnold
Case Number: 2:2017cv02014
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/7/2020 ADOPTING 43 Findings and Recommendations in full, GRANTING 39 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/2019 GRANTING ECF 39-2 Request for Judicial Notice and RECOMMENDING 39 Motion to Dismiss be granted and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/22/2019 ADOPTING 30 findings and recommendations in full. All claims other than a claim for denial of medical care against defendant Dr. K. Win with respect to his denying plaintiff pain medication are DISMISSED. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/10/19 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (cc: assigned Deputy Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/11/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to complete and return the attached form notifying the court how he would like to proceed within 21 days. (Henshaw, R)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/19/18 ORDERING plaintiff is granted 30 days to file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the court's form for filing a prisoner civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/19/2018 VACATING 17 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING Plaintiff 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/17 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court assign a District Judge to his case. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrel randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Robert Lee Taylor signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/08/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?