Bird v. Skillman, et al.
Plaintiff: Donald M. Bird
Defendant: Skillman, Gregg Cohen, Michelle Nasise and David Nelson
Case Number: 2:2017cv02018
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/2018 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed October 26, 2017, are ADOPTED in full; this action is DISMISSED as duplicative of Bird v. County of Tehama, et al., case number 2:13-cv-2549-MCE-CKD, and Bird v. Skillman, et al., case number 2:16-cv-2352-GEB-CMK; and the Clerk is directed to close this case.CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/25/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Hunt, G)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/19/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Hunt, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. Skillman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Nasise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?