Rawat v. Fernandes et al

Plaintiff: Kiran Rawat
Defendant: Tammy Fernandes, Andrew Wolff and Chris Beaty
Case Number: 2:2017cv02100
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/8/18 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court shall VACATE the 35 Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant Andrew Wolff and all pleading, discovery, and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the findings and recommendations. RECOMMENDING that Defendant's request for dismissal 36 be GRANTED. The action be DISMISSED with prejudice based on insufficient service of process. The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close this case. F&R referred to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/4/2018 SETTING a status (pre-trial scheduling) conference set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman and ORDERING parties to file status report(s) not later than 10/4/2018. (Henshaw, R)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/20/18 VACATING 20 F&Rs; DENYING without prejudice the 22 Request for Entry of Default as premature; Clerk to issue summons; plaintiffs to complete service and file proof of service by 08/16/18. After the court has received adequate proof of service, the court will order status reports and schedule a further status conference, if necessary. (Benson, A.)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/2018 ORDERING that the Status (Pre-trial Scheduling) Conference is VACATED and all pleading, discovery, and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the F&R; It is hereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) and the Clerk of Court vacate all dates and close this case. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days.(Fabillaran, J)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/4/2018 ORDERING The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue and send plaintiff one summons for each defendant named in the complaint. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on defendants na med in the complaint by 5/24/2018. Plaintiff shall serve on each defendant, within ten days after the service of process, a copy of this order, and a copy of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge and shall file with the cl erk a certificate reflecting such service. Within 30 days after defendant answers, the parties shall meet and confer in person about the mandatory disclosures. Parties shall file status reports no later than 7/12/2018. A Status Conference is SET for 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Failure to obey federal or local rules, or order of this court, may result in dismissal of this action. (Washington, S)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/29/2018 DENYING 5 Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as premature; Within 14 days, Plaintiff shall pay sanctions to the Clerk of Court; Status (Pre-trial Scheduling) Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; Status reports due by 4/26/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/23/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days of this order, in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to appear at the 2/22/2018 status (pre-trial scheduling) conference. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawat v. Fernandes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiran Rawat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?