Snowden v. Yule et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Snowden, III
Defendant: M. Yule, Mary Housley and Sam H. Wong
Case Number: 2:2017cv02167
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/9/2020 DENYING as moot 70 Motion to Compel Discovery. (Henshaw, R)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/28/20 DENYING 68 Motion for Reconsideration. (Plummer, M)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/29/2020 GRANTING defendants' 66 motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order. The Discovery cut-off deadline is extended to 12/4/2020 and the Dispositive Motion deadline is extended to 3/15/2021. Other than plaintiff's responses to discovery due 7/3/2020, all future discovery shall adhere to the deadlines set forth in the Discovery and Scheduling Order filed 4/7/2020. (Yin, K)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/18/2020 DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. The Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 10/16/2020 and Dispositive Motions deadline is EXTENDED to 1/15/2021. Plaintiff shall respo nd to defendants' previously propounded discovery requests within 45 days after service of this order. Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a copy of plaintiff's opposition and exhibits filed in response to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Tupolo, A)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 57 Findings and Recommendations in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/24/20 DENYING 48 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/13/2020 DENYING without prejudice 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/07/19 GRANTING 46 defendants' request to opt out of the post-screening ADR project; and LIFTING 41 the stay of this action. Defendants shall file and serve their answer to the complaint within 21 days after the filing date of this order; thereafter, the court will set a schedule for this case.(Plummer, M)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/28/19 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The plaintiff shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Plummer, M)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/24/2019 ORDERING, within 21 days, Deputy Attorney General Whitmore shall inquire with the CA Department of Human Resources and the CA Personnel Board in an effort to ascertain the whereabouts of defendant Housley in accordance with this order. (See Order for Details) (Yin, K)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/12/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Curtis Snowden, III. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/4/2017 ORDERING plaintiff shall, within 30 days, submit an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required filing fees in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Yule et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Snowden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Yule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Housley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam H. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?