Pringle v. Gentry et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Denise Pringle
Defendant: Amanda Gentry, Cindy McDonald, Shannon Cluney, Noel Barlow-Hust, Sandy Jones, Judy Mesick and Mark Alan Kubinski
Case Number: 2:2017cv02206
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/2/2018 ORDERING this case TRANSFERRED to the District of Idaho. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/16/18: All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. The Motion for to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12 is now pending before the District Judge assigned to this action. Going f orward, the parties shall conduct pretrial matters, other than discovery motions, before the District Judge assigned to this action. Discovery motions remain referred to the magistrate judge. This matter is REFERRED back to the District Judge assigned to this action. (Kaminski, H)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/27/18: The parties are each ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days, why this case should not be transferred to the District of Idaho pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404. (Kaminski, H)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 ADOPTING 27 Findings and Recommendations IN PART. Defendants' 12 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and Plaintiff's first, third, and fourth claims are DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction. The Court REFERS this matter back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Zignago, K.)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/30/2018 DENYING as moot 25 Motion to Strike and RECOMMENDING that 12 Motion to Dismiss be granted and that this action be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction and on the grounds of forum non conveniens. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/15/18, ORDERING that plaintiff's 19 motion to vacate is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/22/2018 DENYING 10 ex-parte motion to enforce compliance with order regarding service. (Zignago, K.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/30/17: The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285, one summons, a copy of the complaint, and an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Denise Pringle
Represented By: Pamela Denise Pringle - "PRO SE E-FILER"(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Cluney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Barlow-Hust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Mesick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Alan Kubinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?