Pacific Coast Horseshoeing School, Inc. et al v. Grafilo, et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Horseshoeing School, Inc., Bob Smith and Esteban Narez
Defendant: Grafilo and Michael Marion
Case Number: 2:2017cv02217
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/11/18 ORDERING for the reasons above, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss with prejudice.(Becknal, R)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 GRANTING an Extension of Time for Defendant to answer the complaint until 1/5/2018. (Hunt, G)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/06/17 ORDERING that Defendants' last day to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be no later than 12/22/2017. The Parties shall confer as required by FRCP 26(f) and prepare and submit a joint status report that includes the FRCP 26(f) discovery plan by 1/12/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Horseshoeing School, Inc. et al v. Grafilo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Horseshoeing School, Inc.
Represented By: Paul V. Avelar, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Keith Diggs, PHV
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Smith
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Narez
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grafilo
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marion
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?